Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Declaration of Rights – Access to Information
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that the people have a compelling interest in access to timely and transparent information regarding how, when, and by and from whom funds are raised and spent to influence State elections; requiring the General Assembly to implement and enforce the interests enumerated in this amendment through appropriate legislation; and submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1035
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Declaration of Rights – Access to Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Declaration of Rights – Access to Information
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page