Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Brooks, Ebersole, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Lam, Morhaim, Sydnor, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of the Inspector General in the Baltimore County public school system to provide independent evaluation and recommendations to improve the effectiveness, productivity, or efficiency of local school system programs, policies, practices, and operations; requiring the County Council of Baltimore County to appoint the Inspector General; requiring the Inspector General to coordinate with the Baltimore County public school system to develop a certain work plan and establish certain goals and priorities; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (130-2)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (130-2) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2018 3/18/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-3A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page