Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Madaleno, Lee, Zucker, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring county boards of education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, to report specified information relating to the provision of specialized intervention services to the State Department of Education and the General Assembly on or before December 1 each year; requiring county boards and the Department to publish annually this same information on their Web sites; requiring the Department to establish guidelines for the report that each county board is required to submit regarding specialized intervention services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0286
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
6/29/2016
Legislative Date
6/29/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734736/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {845762/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-17)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-19)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 6/29/2016 6/29/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {734736/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {845762/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (121-17) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (120-19) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Text - Chapter - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
(   5-111.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page