Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding positive community feedback to the list of records that are not considered personnel records for certain purposes; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop a process for citizens to submit positive community feedback; requiring each law enforcement agency to adopt the uniform citizen positive community feedback process; and requiring a law enforcement agency to maintain a certain record that is subject to public inspection.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0973
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0069 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/2/2024 5:54 AM
Click to return on the top page