Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Minors
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Minors to study the processes by which the State and local governments currently monitor guardians of vulnerable minors; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations on the need for enhanced monitoring of guardians of vulnerable minors, including any necessary regulatory changes or legislation; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Minors
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2022 10:43 AM
Click to return on the top page