Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Board of Trustees Membership - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the membership of the Board of Trustees of the College of Southern Maryland by two members, from 9 to 11; and requiring the two additional members of the Board of Trustees to be residents of Charles County.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - College of Southern Maryland - Board of Trustees Membership - Alterations
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/25/2024 10:59 AM
Click to return on the top page