Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services, for students committed to its custody, to notify a local superintendent of schools or school principal of a student's reportable offense or offense related to the student's membership in a criminal gang; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations to ensure that certain information is used to provide appropriate educational programming and services for the social, emotional, and academic development of the student and to maintain a safe and secure school environment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0867
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1147 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/16/2018
Legislative Date
11/16/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {758572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {758572/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Judiciary 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
(   7-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page