Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipality to designate, by law, an area within that political subdivision as a tourism zone under certain circumstances; providing that the designation of an area as a tourism zone may not preclude the area from being designated as an arts and entertainment district; authorizing a county or municipality to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from certain admissions or amusement charges levied in a tourism zone; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1281
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163224/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   18-401 through 18-403 )
(   9-268, 9-269 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page