Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures for the dispute settlement mechanism under the Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act and applying the mechanism to any complaint or demand formally arising on or after October 1, 2023, with a certain exception.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0309
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0462 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2023
Legislative Date
10/17/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/17/2023 10/17/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {193829/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 8:04 AM
Click to return on the top page