Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include the nonprofit corporation serving as the economic development authority of the City of Cambridge and Dorchester County (the Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.); providing that a requirement to provide notice of a claim does not apply to unliquidated damages actions against the Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc., or its employees; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0199
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0955 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2021
Legislative Date
9/17/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2021 9/17/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 9:26 AM
Click to return on the top page