Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child Victims
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to admit into evidence in certain criminal proceedings certain out of court statements made by a child who is under the age of 13 years and a victim or witness in a case concerning a crime of violence, subject to certain requirements.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0284
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child Victims
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child Victims
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page