Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that equity be considered when State transportation plans, reports, and goals are developed; altering the membership of the advisory committee on State transportation goals; establishing the Commission on Transportation Equity to assist in developing policies and performance measures to ensure the State transportation system is equitable; requiring the Department of Transportation to conduct transit equity analyses and consult with certain communities before announcing or proposing service changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0141
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 7:07 PM
Click to return on the top page