Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the language of a provision of law requiring the expungement of certain records maintained by the State or a political subdivision of the State relating to the charging of certain offenses under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page