Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum period of imprisonment for a first conviction for manslaughter by vehicle or vessel from 10 years to 20 years and for a second or subsequent conviction, or having been previously convicted for certain other crimes, from 15 years to 30 years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0264
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2023
Legislative Date
10/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2023 10/03/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Senate 2/22/2024 2/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Referred Judiciary 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page