Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland State Archives)
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting the acquisition of certain fine art or decorative art by the State Archives from certain provisions of State procurement law.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2018
Legislative Date
9/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216184/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-6)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2018 9/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {216184/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-6) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page