Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law governing rating organizations apply to rate making for title insurance; authorizing a title insurer to satisfy its obligations to make filings by being a member of or a subscriber to a specified title rating organization and authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to accept filings on its behalf from the title rating organization; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017, January 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2016
Legislative Date
9/23/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2017
Legislative Date
1/05/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2016 9/23/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Senate 1/05/2017 1/05/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {997874/1 Adopted 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Referred Economic Matters 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text - Chapter - Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
(   11-202, 11-403, 11-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page