Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Elevators - Inspections
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, beginning January 1, 2023, an elevator installed in a privately owned single-family residence is subject to certain provisions of law requiring elevator inspections.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Elevators - Inspections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Residential Elevators - Inspections
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page