Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the court to decree a limited divorce; and altering certain grounds for an absolute divorce.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0014
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0639 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2022
Legislative Date
11/01/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2022 11/01/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/1/2023 10:58 AM
Click to return on the top page