Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information
Sponsored by
Senator A. Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the statement regarding earnings required to be provided to employees by employers be written on the physical pay stub or online pay statement and include the employer's name, the dates of work covered by the pay period, the number of hours worked, the rates of pay, the gross and net pay earned, the amount and purpose of all deductions, a description of the information used by the employer to calculate the employee's gross and net pay, and for each employee paid at a piece rate, the applicable rate and number of pieces; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0385
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683623/1
Proceedings
27AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
27AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2024 2/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments {683623/1 27AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2024 2/11/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted 27AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments {683623/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information
Senate 2/22/2024 2/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Referred Economic Matters 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/27/2024 8:29 AM
Click to return on the top page