Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to access electronically from the Maryland Department of Health a copy of a birth certificate; authorizing the Administration to provide a copy of a birth certificate to a certain person under certain circumstances; authorizing the Administration to set and collect a fee for processing and issuing a birth certificate or for a certain report; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2017
Legislative Date
10/12/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2017 10/12/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Birth and Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {637173/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Lam) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page