Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Driver Education and Career and Technical Education - Funding (Driver Education and Career Education Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senator Watson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for each of fiscal years 2026 through 2031, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill certain appropriations to the State Department of Education for the Coalition for Public Safety Training in Schools, Inc., in Prince George's County for certain purposes related to driver education and career and technical education; and requiring the Department to hire an independent contractor to conduct an annual evaluation of the impact of the funding provided by the Act on increasing the number of career-ready students.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2023
Legislative Date
10/31/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2023 10/31/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Department of Education - Driver Education and Career and Technical Education - Funding (Driver Education and Career Education Act of 2024)
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2024 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page