Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Fines, Fees, and Other Monetary Payments - Methods of Payment
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore City, on or before January 1, 2020, to accept payment of a fee, a fine, or other monetary payment by at least two of three methods, including by mail, in person at a certain location, or online through a City website or other third-party payment system designated by the City; and requiring all departments of the City except the Department of Transportation to offer residents who have not registered for online payments the option of paying by mail or in person at a certain location.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/07/2018
Legislative Date
11/07/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684139/1
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/07/2018 11/07/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Fines, Fees, and Other Monetary Payments - Methods of Payment
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {684139/1 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {684139/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Fines, Fees, and Other Monetary Payments - Methods of Payment
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page