Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Shark or Elasmobranch Fins - Restriction on Possession, Distribution, or Consumption
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering for sale, trading, or distributing a fin or tail of a shark or other elasmobranch; exempting specified persons from the prohibition against possessing a shark fin under specified circumstances; authorizing a person to use a ray or skate as bait under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from selling or consuming shark fin soup; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations to implement the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/20/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 7/20/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page