Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a State correctional officer for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and providing that the Act applies only prospectively and may not be applied or interpreted to have any effect on or application to any claims arising from events occurring before October 1, 2018.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0576 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/08/2017
Legislative Date
11/08/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/08/2017 11/08/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {877971/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Referred Economic Matters 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text - Chapter -
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page