Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "person in a position of authority" for purposes of a certain prohibition against engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor to include an individual under contract with a child care facility, certain commercial or nonprofit instructional programs, sports, scouting, recreational activities, camps, religious institutions, or any unit of government; prohibiting a certain violation from being considered a lesser included crime of another crime; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0223
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0223 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page