Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund – Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund to provide grants to certain eligible persons, institutions, and organizations to conduct pediatric cancer research, prevention, and treatment; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt regulations to implement a pediatric cancer research grant program; and requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on individual income tax return forms for voluntary contributions to the Fund and to include certain information in each individual income tax return package.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/26/2021
Legislative Date
8/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/26/2021 8/26/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund – Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page