Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Justice Restoration Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Senators Folden, Bailey, Carozza, Corderman, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Mautz, McKay, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court to establish that the juvenile court has exclusive original jurisdiction over a child who is at least 10 years old alleged to have committed a crime involving the use or possession of a firearm; and altering a certain provision of law authorizing a law enforcement officer to conduct an otherwise lawful custodial interrogation of a child if the child's parent, guardian, or custodian consents to the custodial interrogation of the child without the child's consultation with an attorney.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0319
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2023
Legislative Date
10/31/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Restoration Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2023 10/31/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Restoration Act of 2024
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/15/2024 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page