Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody, interrogates or charges a child with a criminal violation to provide reasonable notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and a notice has been provided to the child's parents, guardian or custodian; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0269
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0136 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 7:33 AM
Click to return on the top page