Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Waugh
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of aviation gasoline for purposes of the motor fuel tax; providing that "aviation gasoline" is gasoline that is used to propel gasoline-powered aircraft and does not include gasoline used to propel a motor vehicle; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0055
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0870 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2016
Legislative Date
9/21/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {815965/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2016 9/21/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Referred Ways and Means 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {815965/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page