Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the maximum speed limit for all expressways and interstate highways that connect with Interstate 495 in the State be the same as for Interstate 495 at the point of connection for 5 miles from the point of entrance to or exit from Interstate 495; and requiring the State Highway Administration to post notice of the maximum speed limit for an expressway at no greater than 5-mile intervals.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/14/2017
Legislative Date
11/14/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/14/2017 11/14/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   21-801.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page