Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that it is lawful for a person to intercept a wire, oral, or electronic communication if the person is working as a fair housing tester for a fair housing testing program operated by the federal government, the State, a local government, or a nonprofit civil rights organization under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0392
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0047 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2023
Legislative Date
10/17/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/17/2023 10/17/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/31/2024 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page