Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for and the maximum amount of a credit against the State income tax for certain long-term care insurance premiums paid by a taxpayer with a Maryland adjusted gross income of less than $250,000 for long-term care insurance purchased before January 1, 2005; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0062
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page