Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of presumed abandoned property valued at $1,000 or more to send written notice to the apparent owner by certified mail, return receipt requested, rather than by first-class mail; and requiring the holder of abandoned property valued at $1,000 or more to keep records relating to that property.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2021
Legislative Date
10/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2021 10/26/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 11:10 AM
Click to return on the top page