Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2022, or later.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0875
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0168 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957570/1
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {957570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {503726/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {463925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {573228/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {957570/1 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Committee Amendment {957570/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Floor Amendment {503726/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Floor Amendment {463925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-30) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Floor Amendment {573228/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (15-30) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Economic Matters 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:38 PM
Click to return on the top page