Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to be the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; establishing the Department as a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government; providing that the head of the Department is the Secretary of Emergency Management; requiring the Secretary to be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; specifying that the Department is the successor of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 2/17/2021 4:04 PM
Click to return on the top page