Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Jackson, and Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Adding a requirement to the Emergency Medical System plan for guidelines that authorize emergency medical services personnel to provide emergency medical services to canines injured in the line of duty that is owned by, or whose services are employed by certain law enforcement agencies; prohibiting emergency medical services personnel from providing services to a canine if the personnel are needed concurrently to provide services to individuals; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2021
Legislative Date
10/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2022
Legislative Date
1/16/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2021 10/25/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Senate 1/16/2022 1/16/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page