Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Eckardt, Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a workers' compensation insurer to develop a tiered rating plan that establishes discrete tiers based on risk attributes that are not arbitrary, capricious, or unfairly discriminatory and are reasonably related to the insurer's business and economic purposes; requiring a workers' compensation insurer to submit a tiered rating plan to the Insurance Commissioner at least 30 days in advance of the plan's use; authorizing a workers' compensation insurer to use a specified merit rating plan under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1315
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2016
Legislative Date
10/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2016 10/27/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {667176/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Economic Matters 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
(   11-329 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page