Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards – Investigations – Right to Counsel
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a licensee, certificate holder, or registration holder to be represented by counsel during an investigation by a health occupations board that may result in charges or sanctions except under certain circumstances; and authorizing a licensee, certificate holder, or registration holder to have counsel present at any interview conducted by or on behalf of the heath occupations board during the investigation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards – Investigations – Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {343829/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards – Investigations – Right to Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards – Investigations – Right to Counsel
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Carter) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Griffith) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Floor Amendment {913722/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Floor Amendment {343829/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations Boards – Investigations – Right to Counsel
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page