Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island, in Dorchester County; providing that a person who operates a golf car on a highway in Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring the operator to have a valid driver's license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0193
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0312 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2021
Legislative Date
9/17/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2021 9/17/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page