Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that both parties appear before the court at an absolute divorce hearing in order for the court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0499 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-10)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-11)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (35-10) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Referred Judiciary 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (124-11) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page