Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Baltimore - Schaefer Center for Public Policy - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2025, to include an appropriation of $1,900,000 in the annual budget bill for the Schaefer Center for Public Policy at the University of Baltimore.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0348
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2023
Legislative Date
9/25/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University of Baltimore - Schaefer Center for Public Policy - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2023 9/25/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - University of Baltimore - Schaefer Center for Public Policy - Funding
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2024 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page