Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration, under certain circumstances, suspend the registration of a motor vehicle that incurs a certain toll violation; and altering the authority of the Maryland Transportation Authority to enter certain reciprocal agreements for the enforcement of toll violations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0029
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0435 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/08/2021
Legislative Date
10/08/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/08/2021 10/08/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page