Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Grant Funding - Violence Prevention and Community Service
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to annually include $500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office and the Prince George's County State's Attorney's Office for grants to nonprofit organizations to fund violence prevention and community service initiatives; requiring the offices to establish certain procedures and enhance certain coordination of services; requiring an organization that receives grant funding to comply with certain data sharing and reporting requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Grant Funding - Violence Prevention and Community Service
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-1002.1 )
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 11:56 AM
Click to return on the top page