Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law allowing a surviving parent to inherit certain intestate property if there is a surviving spouse but no surviving issue; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0783
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2017
Legislative Date
10/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2017 10/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page