Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to require certain contractors with access to federal tax information to provide certain information for a certain background investigation; authorizing the Exchange to request from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository a State and national criminal history records check for certain contractors; authorizing the Exchange to collect and submit to the Central Repository certain fees and information from certain contractors; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
(   31-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page