Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a petitioner for a recount to select the method for conducting the recount; limiting the methods from which the selection must be made; requiring a local board of elections to preserve and store certain voter-verifiable paper records in a certain manner and count the voter-verifiable paper record in a manual recount after a certain review; and establishing the process for an automated recount.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0371
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0339 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2023
Legislative Date
9/24/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2023 9/24/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {613726/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2024 2/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 8:07 AM
Click to return on the top page