Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Inclusive and Diverse English Language Arts - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, by December 1, 2022, to develop content standards for inclusive and diverse English language arts to be included in the State Standards and Frameworks for English Language Arts; requiring each county board of education to develop and implement age-appropriate curriculum guides for inclusive and diverse English language arts; and requiring each public school to include inclusive and diverse English language arts in the English language arts curriculum beginning in the 2023-2024 school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Inclusive and Diverse English Language Arts - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page