Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that relates to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to establish a specified board of directors for the purposes of establishing and overseeing a vocational training facility for specified purposes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page