Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste to award grants to county boards of education and public schools to develop and implement programs for reducing food waste and to establish composting of pre-and post-consumer waste; and requiring the Maryland Association for Environmental and Outdoor Education to review grant applications and select recipients to be awarded grants by the State Department of Education.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0150
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page