Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Subcabinet for Children, Youth, and Families appoint a member of the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals; and repealing the requirement that the Board adopt an official seal.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0021
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2022
Legislative Date
1/16/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Senate 1/16/2022 1/16/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page